THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:23:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sana'a Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sana'a Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sana'a Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
Western University
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
01 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2023