THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:24:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Dr
Health Sciences Center
Department of Anesthesia
Room 1320
St. John's NL A1B 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Prince Philip Dr
Health Sciences Center
Department of Anesthesia
Room 1320
St. John's NL A1B 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA ELIZABETH MURPHY-BUSKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY-BUSKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA ELIZABETH MURPHY-BUSKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY-BUSKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022