THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Jan 2025 to 01 Feb 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
27 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jan 2023 to 26 Mar 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 01 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 27 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 26 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2023