THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:43:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional de la Plata Facultad de Ciencias Médicas, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional de la Plata Facultad de Ciencias Médicas, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional de la Plata Facultad de Ciencias Médicas, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
25 Jul 2023 to 30 Apr 2024
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 24 Jul 2023
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 25 Jul 2023 to 30 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 24 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023