THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:00:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imperial College London Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
4N-472
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163405070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imperial College London Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
4N-472
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163405070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Jan 2025
15 Jan 2032
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 16 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jan 15 2032
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHIN SUN YU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. YU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. YU no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. YU’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. YU’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 January, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 January, 2032.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHIN SUN YU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. YU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. YU no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. YU’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. YU’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 January, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 January, 2032.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imperial College London Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 15 Jan 2032

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023