THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King's College London GKT School of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre Department of Thoracic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King's College London GKT School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre Department of Thoracic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN OLUSEGUN ZAYD BELLO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BELLO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BELLO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BELLO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BELLO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BELLO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BELLO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN OLUSEGUN ZAYD BELLO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BELLO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BELLO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BELLO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BELLO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BELLO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BELLO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King's College London GKT School of Medicine, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Solid Organ Transplantation
01 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Solid Organ Transplantation
DATE: 01 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023