THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Palliative Medicine
16 Dec 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Anesthesiology
11 Mar 2024 to 05 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Palliative Medicine
13 Mar 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 16 Dec 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Anesthesiology
DATE: 11 Mar 2024 to 05 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 13 Mar 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2023