THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:12:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kaler, Maneek (Used Until: 02 Jan 2024)
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-264-8311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Westmore Dr.
Suite 103
Toronto ON M9V 1C3
Phone: 416-745-4050
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Kaler, Maneek (Used Until: 02 Jan 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-264-8311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Westmore Dr.
Suite 103
Toronto ON M9V 1C3
Phone: 416-745-4050
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MANEEK PRASHAR may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MANEEK PRASHAR may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2026