THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:16:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Father Muller Medical College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KANNADA, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KANNADA, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Father Muller Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEENA MARENE SOLOMON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SOLOMON is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. SOLOMON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SOLOMON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SOLOMON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SOLOMON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SOLOMON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEENA MARENE SOLOMON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SOLOMON is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. SOLOMON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SOLOMON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SOLOMON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SOLOMON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SOLOMON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Father Muller Medical College, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Apr 2025 to 30 Sep 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Feb 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
25 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Mar 2023 to 24 May 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Apr 2025 to 30 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 25 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Mar 2023 to 24 May 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023