Medical School:
Universidad de la Salle Facultad Mexicana de Medicina, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
16 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
15 Aug 2024 to 15 Dec 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
24 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Sep 2023 to 23 Nov 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
16 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
15 Aug 2024 to 15 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
24 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Sep 2023 to 23 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto