THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:41:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4168378181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6 Albert St
The international Sleep Clinic
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4168378181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6 Albert St
The international Sleep Clinic
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERSIS FIKRY FARAG YOUSEF may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. YOUSEF is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. YOUSEF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YOUSEF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YOUSEF shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. YOUSEF ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. YOUSEF ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERSIS FIKRY FARAG YOUSEF may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. YOUSEF is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. YOUSEF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YOUSEF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YOUSEF shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. YOUSEF ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. YOUSEF ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
12 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
20 Nov 2023 to 11 Feb 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 12 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Nov 2023 to 11 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023