THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Western University
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Western University
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AHMED HANKIR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. HANKIR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HANKIR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HANKIR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HANKIR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 10 August, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. HANKIR's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AHMED HANKIR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. HANKIR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HANKIR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HANKIR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HANKIR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 10 August, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. HANKIR's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026