THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:25:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autónoma de Nuevo León Facultad de Medicina, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario 610 University Ave,
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Autónoma de Nuevo León Facultad de Medicina, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario 610 University Ave,
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIO DIEGO DE LA PENA VILLARREAL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIO DIEGO DE LA PENA VILLARREAL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. DE LA PENA VILLARREAL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autónoma de Nuevo León Facultad de Medicina, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
25 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Apr 2023 to 24 Jun 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 25 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Apr 2023 to 24 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2023