THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:27:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chulalongkorn University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Center For Liver Disease
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Chulalongkorn University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Center For Liver Disease
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATCHA CHEEWASEREECHON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATCHA CHEEWASEREECHON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CHEEWASEREECHON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chulalongkorn University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023