Medical School:
Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine |
03 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 02 Aug 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
03 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 02 Aug 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
03 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine |
11 May 2023 to 02 Aug 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
03 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 02 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
03 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 02 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
03 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE:
11 May 2023 to 02 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa