THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:03:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
08 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
15 Jan 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 14 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 08 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 15 Jan 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024