THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:42:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501-1275 Finch Ave W
Dandelion Allergy Centre
North York ON M3J 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-348 Bronte St S
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Milton ON L9T 5B6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1550 South Gateway Rd
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1275 Finch Ave W
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Unit 501
North York ON M3J 0L5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Halton Healthcare (Oakville Trafalgar Hospital, Milton District Hospital, Georgetown Hospital)
Department of Pediatrics
3001 Hospital Gate, Oakville, ON L6M 0L8
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 ext 4670
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501-1275 Finch Ave W
Dandelion Allergy Centre
North York ON M3J 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-348 Bronte St S
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Milton ON L9T 5B6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1550 South Gateway Rd
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1275 Finch Ave W
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Unit 501
North York ON M3J 0L5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Halton Healthcare (Oakville Trafalgar Hospital, Milton District Hospital, Georgetown Hospital)
Department of Pediatrics
3001 Hospital Gate, Oakville, ON L6M 0L8
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 ext 4670
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GIULIA MARTONE may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics and Clinical Immunology and Allergy.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GIULIA MARTONE may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics and Clinical Immunology and Allergy.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jan 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 06 Jun 2026