THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 347 Rumsey Rd
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute - Rumsey Centre
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 347 Rumsey Rd
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute - Rumsey Centre
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ‪YOED STEINMETZ‬‏ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ‪YOED STEINMETZ‬‏ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. STEINMETZ‬‏ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
16 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Aug 2023 to 15 Oct 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 16 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 15 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023