Medical School:
Midwestern University Chicago College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 05 Jul 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
06 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 05 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
06 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto