THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:17:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUHAIL SALEM MOHAMMED OBAID ALMANSOORI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMANSOORI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALMANSOORI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMANSOORI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALMANSOORI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMANSOORI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMANSOORI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUHAIL SALEM MOHAMMED OBAID ALMANSOORI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMANSOORI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALMANSOORI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMANSOORI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALMANSOORI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMANSOORI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMANSOORI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: United Arab Emirates University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
10 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 09 Jul 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
08 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 10 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 09 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 08 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023