THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:31:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Roger-Guindon Ave
l'Avantage Suites / unit 1103
Ottawa ON K1G 3Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138830721
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Roger-Guindon Ave
l'Avantage Suites / unit 1103
Ottawa ON K1G 3Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138830721
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOUDA MOHAMMED RASHID AL AMRI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL AMRI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL AMRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL AMRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL AMRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL AMRI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL AMRI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOUDA MOHAMMED RASHID AL AMRI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL AMRI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL AMRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL AMRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL AMRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL AMRI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL AMRI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023