THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:47:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
23 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
01 Nov 2023 to 22 Jan 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Nov 2023 to 22 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023