THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:27:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Stanford School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New Hampshire
USA - New York
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Stanford School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New Hampshire
USA - New York
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
03 Jul 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 03 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from July 3rd, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vinca Wing Kar Chow in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(“Undertaking”)
of

DR. VINCA WING KAR CHOW

(“Dr. Chow”)
to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; “OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Chow, certificate of registration number 145587, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-455266-H2Z7T2 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anesthesiology and critical care practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Chow, undertake that I will not engage in the practise of medicine in Ontario except as part of my participation in, and until my successful completion of, a minimum one-year fellowship program in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another fellowship program in Ontario approved by the College.

(6) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to participate in and successfully complete a minimum one- year fellowship program (“the Program”) in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another fellowship program in Ontario approved by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to ensure that the Director of the Program provides reports to the College on a quarterly basis, or more frequently if the Director of the Program has concerns about my standard of practice; and

(c) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Program within one (1) month of completion. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(12) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(13) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chow engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in their anesthesiology and critical care practice. In response to the investigation:

Dr. Chow has agreed to participate in and successfully complete a minimum one-year fellowship program in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another program in Ontario approved by the College.

Dr. Chow will not engage in the practise of medicine in Ontario except as part of their participation in, and until their successful completion of, the fellowship program.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Chiefs of Staff:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking; and/or

(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

Dr. VINCA WING KAR CHOW may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology and critical care medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from July 3rd, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vinca Wing Kar Chow in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(“Undertaking”)
of

DR. VINCA WING KAR CHOW

(“Dr. Chow”)
to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; “OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Chow, certificate of registration number 145587, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-455266-H2Z7T2 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anesthesiology and critical care practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Chow, undertake that I will not engage in the practise of medicine in Ontario except as part of my participation in, and until my successful completion of, a minimum one-year fellowship program in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another fellowship program in Ontario approved by the College.

(6) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to participate in and successfully complete a minimum one- year fellowship program (“the Program”) in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another fellowship program in Ontario approved by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to ensure that the Director of the Program provides reports to the College on a quarterly basis, or more frequently if the Director of the Program has concerns about my standard of practice; and

(c) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Program within one (1) month of completion. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Chow, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(12) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(13) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chow engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in their anesthesiology and critical care practice. In response to the investigation:

Dr. Chow has agreed to participate in and successfully complete a minimum one-year fellowship program in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another program in Ontario approved by the College.

Dr. Chow will not engage in the practise of medicine in Ontario except as part of their participation in, and until their successful completion of, the fellowship program.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Chiefs of Staff:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking; and/or

(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

Dr. VINCA WING KAR CHOW may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology and critical care medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Jul 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vinca Wing Kar Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 3rd, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chow engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in their anesthesiology and critical care practice. In response to the investigation:

Dr. Chow has agreed to participate in and successfully complete a minimum one-year fellowship program in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another program in Ontario approved by the College.

Dr. Chow will not engage in the practise of medicine in Ontario except as part of their participation in, and until their successful completion of, the fellowship program.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Jul 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vinca Wing Kar Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 3rd, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chow engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in their anesthesiology and critical care practice. In response to the investigation:

Dr. Chow has agreed to participate in and successfully complete a minimum one-year fellowship program in anesthesiology at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another program in Ontario approved by the College.

Dr. Chow will not engage in the practise of medicine in Ontario except as part of their participation in, and until their successful completion of, the fellowship program.

Training

Medical School: Stanford School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2023