THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mohammed Bin Rashid University of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatrics
.
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Extension: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Mohammed Bin Rashid University of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatrics
.
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Extension: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIA ABDULRAHIM ABDULLA AHMAD ALMULLA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMULLA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALMULLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMULLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALMULLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMULLA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMULLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIA ABDULRAHIM ABDULLA AHMAD ALMULLA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMULLA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALMULLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMULLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALMULLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMULLA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMULLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mohammed Bin Rashid University of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
12 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
06 Apr 2023 to 11 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 12 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Pediatrics
DATE: 06 Apr 2023 to 11 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2023