THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:14:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: İstanbul Üniversitesi - Cerrahpasa, Cerrahpasa Tıp Fakültesi, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
6th Floor – The Arthritis Centre
Division of Rheumatology
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TURKISH
Medical School: İstanbul Üniversitesi - Cerrahpasa, Cerrahpasa Tıp Fakültesi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
6th Floor – The Arthritis Centre
Division of Rheumatology
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OZUN BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OZUN BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BAYINDIR TSECHELIDIS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: İstanbul Üniversitesi - Cerrahpasa, Cerrahpasa Tıp Fakültesi, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
26 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
01 Feb 2023 to 25 Apr 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE: 26 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Feb 2023 to 25 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jan 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2023