THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:08:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Zagazig University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whinney Heys Road England FY3 8NR
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Zagazig University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whinney Heys Road England FY3 8NR
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR MOHAMED SAID MOHAMED GAMAL AHMED SETIH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SETIH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SETIH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SETIH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SETIH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SETIH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SETIH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR MOHAMED SAID MOHAMED GAMAL AHMED SETIH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SETIH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SETIH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SETIH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SETIH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SETIH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SETIH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Zagazig University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 28 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 28 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2024