Medical School:
Arabian Gulf University College of Medicine and Medical Sciences, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
22 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 21 Sep 2023 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
22 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 21 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University