THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:23:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ibn Mateer Street
al-Anwar
AlAmal Complex for Mental Health
927G+8F4
al-Damam 32312
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ibn Mateer Street
al-Anwar
AlAmal Complex for Mental Health
927G+8F4
al-Damam 32312
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOAA ABDULHAMEED AL BAGSHI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL BAGSHI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL BAGSHI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL BAGSHI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL BAGSHI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL BAGSHI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL BAGSHI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOAA ABDULHAMEED AL BAGSHI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL BAGSHI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL BAGSHI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL BAGSHI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL BAGSHI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL BAGSHI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL BAGSHI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023