THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:55:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 107-3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Phone: 905-237-5433
Fax: 905-747-1511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Apr 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 10 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 107-3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Phone: 905-237-5433
Fax: 905-747-1511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Apr 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 10 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Apr 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 10 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HARDIK BHATT may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HARDIK BHATT may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Feb 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2023