THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: ALEYNABI, SAIMA (Used Until: 14 Dec 2022)
Medical School: Jinnah Sindh Medical University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-1225 Maple Avenue
Milton Health Centre
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056936400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-1225 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Phone: 9056936400
Fax: 9056936405
Address: Langham House
368-370 Ashton Road
Oldham Medical Services
Oldham Greater Manchester United Kingdom OL8 3HF
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Nye Bevan House
Maclure Road
Rochdale Greater Manchester United Kingdom OL11 1DN
Phone: +447725796327
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SY QURESHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi (CPSO#: 145942 )

General Information

Former Name: ALEYNABI, SAIMA (Used Until: 14 Dec 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Jinnah Sindh Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-1225 Maple Avenue
Milton Health Centre
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056936400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-1225 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Phone: 9056936400
Fax: 9056936405
Address: Langham House
368-370 Ashton Road
Oldham Medical Services
Oldham Greater Manchester United Kingdom OL8 3HF
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Nye Bevan House
Maclure Road
Rochdale Greater Manchester United Kingdom OL11 1DN
Phone: +447725796327
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SY QURESHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi (CPSO#: 145942 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIMA YASSER QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIMA YASSER QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jinnah Sindh Medical University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2023