THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:00:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Research Station
198 University Rd
Warialda NSW 2402
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Research Station
198 University Rd
Warialda NSW 2402
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASRA SAID SALEM AL JAAFARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL JAAFARI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. AL JAAFARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL JAAFARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL JAAFARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL JAAFARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL JAAFARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASRA SAID SALEM AL JAAFARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL JAAFARI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. AL JAAFARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL JAAFARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL JAAFARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL JAAFARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL JAAFARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
25 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
04 Jul 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 25 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 04 Jul 2023 to 24 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2023