THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON N8N 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-979-5260
Fax: 519-979-8085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON N8N 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-979-5260
Fax: 519-979-8085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 05 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. INDERPAL SINGH may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. INDERPAL SINGH may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2024