Medical School:
King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Solid Organ Transplantation |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases |
01 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Solid Organ Transplantation
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
01 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University