THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:13:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYRILLOS MEDHAT FARAG ALLA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FARAG ALLA is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. FARAG ALLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FARAG ALLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FARAG ALLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FARAG ALLA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FARAG ALLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYRILLOS MEDHAT FARAG ALLA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FARAG ALLA is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. FARAG ALLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FARAG ALLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FARAG ALLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FARAG ALLA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FARAG ALLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
EL - General Internal Medicine
14 Feb 2023 to 13 Mar 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 14 Feb 2023 to 13 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2023