THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:08:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St.Michael Hospital
Neurosurgery Department
Toronto ON
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0000000000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
London Health Science Center University Campus
Clinical Neurological Science Center
Neurosurgery Department
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St.Michael Hospital
Neurosurgery Department
Toronto ON
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0000000000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
London Health Science Center University Campus
Clinical Neurological Science Center
Neurosurgery Department
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSAM ABDULRAHMAN H FALLATAH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. FALLATAH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. FALLATAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FALLATAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FALLATAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. FALLATAH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. FALLATAH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 27 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSAM ABDULRAHMAN H FALLATAH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. FALLATAH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. FALLATAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FALLATAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FALLATAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. FALLATAH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. FALLATAH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 27 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2025 to 27 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
15 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jul 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 27 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 15 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 27 Aug 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 27 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2023