THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:08:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Avenue
St. Peter's Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
Suite 127
Hamilton Ontario L8M 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 12326
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Nov 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Avenue
St. Peter's Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
Suite 127
Hamilton Ontario L8M 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 12326
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Nov 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN NADEEM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN NADEEM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2023