THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:21:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universitat de València Facultat de Medicina e Odontologia, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universitat de València Facultat de Medicina e Odontologia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERSES NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NERSES NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. NERSESYAN KOCHARYAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universitat de València Facultat de Medicina e Odontologia, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
26 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2023 to 25 Aug 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 26 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 25 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023