THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:55:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Abdeen, Rhys (Used Until: 18 Jan 2023)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-6521
Extension: 6366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2244 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1B 4C4
Phone: (613)-824-6080
Extension: 269
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Abdeen, Rhys (Used Until: 18 Jan 2023)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-6521
Extension: 6366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2244 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1B 4C4
Phone: (613)-824-6080
Extension: 269
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHYS ANDREAS LINTHORST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINTHORST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHYS ANDREAS LINTHORST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINTHORST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023