Medical School:
University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology |
05 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 04 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Cardiology |
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
DATE:
05 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 04 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Cardiology
DATE:
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto