THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: Alajmy, Naser A M S (Used Until: 02 Feb 2023)
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland - Medical University of Bahrain, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6th Ring Road, Road 602, Block 6
Farwaniya Hospital
Department of Surgery
Sabah Al-Nasir
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Alajmy, Naser A M S (Used Until: 02 Feb 2023)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland - Medical University of Bahrain, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6th Ring Road, Road 602, Block 6
Farwaniya Hospital
Department of Surgery
Sabah Al-Nasir
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASER A M S ALBARRAK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALBARRAK is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALBARRAK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALBARRAK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALBARRAK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALBARRAK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALBARRAK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASER A M S ALBARRAK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALBARRAK is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALBARRAK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALBARRAK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALBARRAK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALBARRAK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALBARRAK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland - Medical University of Bahrain, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PEAP - R - General Surgery
09 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - General Surgery
DATE: 09 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2023