THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:10:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
01 Sep 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
09 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Radiology
01 Jul 2023 to 08 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
DATE: 01 Sep 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Radiology
DATE: 09 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 08 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023