THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:49:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bahri College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Bahri College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bahri College of Medicine, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2023 to 29 Feb 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
24 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Mar 2023 to 23 May 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 29 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 24 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Mar 2023 to 23 May 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023