THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chhattisgarh Institute of Medical Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Rd
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Pathology
London ON N6A5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 34085
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5V1
Phone: 18006682714
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kansas
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Chhattisgarh Institute of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Rd
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Pathology
London ON N6A5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 34085
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5V1
Phone: 18006682714
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kansas
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 23 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Anurag Sharma may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Anurag Sharma may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chhattisgarh Institute of Medical Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 May 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2023