THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:08:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main Street W
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main Street W
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BATAL METREK E ALDOSARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALDOSARI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALDOSARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDOSARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALDOSARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALDOSARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALDOSARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BATAL METREK E ALDOSARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALDOSARI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALDOSARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDOSARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALDOSARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALDOSARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALDOSARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud bin Abdulaziz University for Health Sciences College of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
28 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
10 Jul 2024 to 27 Sep 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 28 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 10 Jul 2024 to 27 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025