Medical School:
Université de Lausanne Faculté de Biologie et de Médecine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine |
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto