THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:12:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital (SMH)
Department of Ophthalmology
36 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital (SMH)
Department of Ophthalmology
36 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABELA MARTINS MELO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MARTINS MELO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MARTINS MELO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MARTINS MELO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MARTINS MELO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MARTINS MELO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MARTINS MELO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABELA MARTINS MELO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MARTINS MELO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MARTINS MELO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MARTINS MELO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MARTINS MELO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MARTINS MELO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MARTINS MELO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023