Medical School:
Pontificia Universidad Católica de Chile Escuela de Medicina, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
23 Aug 2024 to 31 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
25 Jul 2024 to 22 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 24 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
15 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology |
23 Aug 2023 to 14 Nov 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
23 Aug 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
25 Jul 2024 to 22 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 24 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
15 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
23 Aug 2023 to 14 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto