THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:00:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Los Andes Facultad de Medicina (Chile), 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The hospital for sick children
Division of paediatric medicine in the department of Paediatrics
University of Toronto
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 University Ave
The hospital for sick children
Division of paediatric medicine in the department of Paediatrics
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de Los Andes Facultad de Medicina (Chile), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The hospital for sick children
Division of paediatric medicine in the department of Paediatrics
University of Toronto
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 University Ave
The hospital for sick children
Division of paediatric medicine in the department of Paediatrics
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MACARENA ANDREA PALOMER MUSIC may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PALOMER MUSIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PALOMER MUSIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PALOMER MUSIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PALOMER MUSIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PALOMER MUSIC ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PALOMER MUSIC ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MACARENA ANDREA PALOMER MUSIC may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PALOMER MUSIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PALOMER MUSIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PALOMER MUSIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PALOMER MUSIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PALOMER MUSIC ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PALOMER MUSIC ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Los Andes Facultad de Medicina (Chile), 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023