THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:05:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 University Ave
Kingston ON K7L 3N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 University Ave
Kingston ON K7L 3N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL KHALID A ALFOUZAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALFOUZAN is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. ALFOUZAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFOUZAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALFOUZAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALFOUZAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALFOUZAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 23 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL KHALID A ALFOUZAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALFOUZAN is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. ALFOUZAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFOUZAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALFOUZAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALFOUZAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALFOUZAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 23 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 23 Sep 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 23 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 23 Sep 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 23 Sep 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023