THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fatemieh University of Medical Sciences, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Marks Street
Atikokan Medical Clinic
Atikokan Ontario P0T 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 597-2721
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1405 Edward Street
Notre-Dame Hospital
Specialty Clinic
First Floor
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Phone: 7053720072
Fax: 8554613552

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Fatemieh University of Medical Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Marks Street
Atikokan Medical Clinic
Atikokan Ontario P0T 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 597-2721
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1405 Edward Street
Notre-Dame Hospital
Specialty Clinic
First Floor
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Phone: 7053720072
Fax: 8554613552

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Feb 2025
18 May 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 24 2025
EXPIRY DATE: May 18 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARYAM AGHDAM POUR may practise medicine only:

(i) in the Practice Ready Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed;

(ii) to the extent required to complete the Practice Ready Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(iii) under supervision by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the Practice Ready Assessment
Program, at a level of supervision determined by the director of the Practice Ready Assessment Program.

2. Dr. AGHDAM POUR may not charge a fee for medical services.

3. Dr. AGHDAM POUR may not be the Most Responsible Physician.

4. This certificate expires on the earlier of:

(i) when Dr. AGHDAM POUR is no longer enrolled in the Practice Ready Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1); or

(ii) twelve weeks from the date of issuance.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 February, 2025 and expires on or before 18 May, 2025, or when Dr. AGHDAM POUR’s enrolment in the Practice Ready Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARYAM AGHDAM POUR may practise medicine only:

(i) in the Practice Ready Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed;

(ii) to the extent required to complete the Practice Ready Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(iii) under supervision by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the Practice Ready Assessment
Program, at a level of supervision determined by the director of the Practice Ready Assessment Program.

2. Dr. AGHDAM POUR may not charge a fee for medical services.

3. Dr. AGHDAM POUR may not be the Most Responsible Physician.

4. This certificate expires on the earlier of:

(i) when Dr. AGHDAM POUR is no longer enrolled in the Practice Ready Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1); or

(ii) twelve weeks from the date of issuance.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 February, 2025 and expires on or before 18 May, 2025, or when Dr. AGHDAM POUR’s enrolment in the Practice Ready Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatemieh University of Medical Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 May 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2023